Global Patent Index - EP 0986987 A2

EP 0986987 A2 2000-03-22 - portable kinetic vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

portable kinetic vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Tragbarer kinetischer Staubsauger

Title (fr)

Aspirateur cinétique portable

Publication

EP 0986987 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99117929 A

Priority

IT MO980191 A

Abstract (en)

A portable kinetic vacuum cleaner constituted by an elongated box-like containment body which defines an inlet at one end and an ergonomic handle at the other end; the body accommodates at least a bag for collecting waste and a connected suction motor assembly which can be operated by the user by means of repeated impulses thanks to corresponding manual means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 5/02; A47L 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/02 (2006.01); A47L 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/24 (2013.01); A47L 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0986987 A2 20000322; EP 0986987 A3 20010328; IT 1306356 B1 20010606; IT MO980191 A1 20000315

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050401

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47L 5/02 A, 7A 47L 5/24 B, 7F 04D 25/02 B, 7A 47L 5/06 B

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI