Global patent index - EP 0987055 A1

EP 0987055 A1 2000-03-22 - Mixer

Title (en)

Mixer

Title (de)

Mischvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Mélangeur

Publication

EP 0987055 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118275 A

Priority

DE 29816531 U

Abstract (en)

The drive shaft unit of a mixing apparatus has an outer shaft (28) and a moving inner shaft (30). One shaft is locked (54) with the mixing tool (16), in a force fit, relative to the direction of mixing tool (16) rotation. The other shaft is connected to the mixing tool shaft so that a relative rotation between the inner (30) and outer (28) shafts gives an axial lock for the mixing tool (16) at the drive shaft unit (18) through the mixing tool drive shaft.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Mischvorrichtung für pharmazeutische, kosmetische und dgl. Produkte, mit einem Mischelement (16), das in einem einen i.w. zylindrischen Innenraum ausbildenden Behälterkörper (10) mittels einer Antriebswelleneinheit (18) antreibbar ausgebildet ist, wobei die Antriebswelleneinheit eine Außenwelle (28) und eine darin bewegbar geführte Innenwelle (30) aufweist, eine der Wellen an einem Eingriffsabschnitt (54) hinsichtlich einer Drehbewegung des Mischelements (16) kraftschlüssig mit diesem verbindbar ausgebildet ist und die andere der Welle mit dem Mischelement (16) so verbindbar ausgebildet ist, dass durch eine Relativdrehung zwischen Innenwelle (30) und Außenwelle (28) die andere der Wellen das Mischelement (16) an der Antriebswelleneinheit (18) bezogen auf eine Axialrichtung derselben festlegt. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987055 A1 20000322; EP 0987055 B1 20030319; AT 234668 T 20030415

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031222

2004-02-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2003-07-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WEPA APOTHEKENBEDARF GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI NL

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: SI

2003-03-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020508

2001-01-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH FR IT LI NL

2000-12-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000920

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI NL

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI