Global Patent Index - EP 0987056 A2

EP 0987056 A2 2000-03-22 - Automatic paint mixing machine

Title (en)

Automatic paint mixing machine

Title (de)

Automatische Farbmischmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine automatique à mélanger la peinture

Publication

EP 0987056 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 99402178 A

Priority

US 15351898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5947598A] Automatic paint stirring equipment having a rack with a plurality of vertically spaced drive units wherein each drive unit has an interior. A closed loop belt is rotatably mounted within the interior of each drive unit and this belt has longitudinally spaced teeth on one side of it. A motor rotatably drives the drive belts in the drive units in unison with each other. The shelves support one or more paint cans in a side by side relationship with each can having a cover disposed across its open top. A stirring element is disposed within the interior of the paint can while a shaft is connected to the stirring element and rotatably mounted to the cover so that a portion of the shaft protrudes upwardly from the cover. A gear wheel is coaxially secured to the upwardly protruding portion of the shaft. A guide assembly is secured to the rack and engages the drive shaft to guide the drive shaft between an engaged position, in which the gear wheel on the drive shaft meshingly engages the drive belt from the drive unit, and a disengaged position in which the paint can with its attached cover is removed from the rack for use.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne une machine automatique à mélanger la peinture comprenant au moins une boîte de peinture (16) présentant un couvercle (32), un élément d'agitation (34) disposé dans la boîte de peinture et relié à un arbre (36) monté en rotation sur le couvercle (32), l'arbre (36) faisant saillie vers le haut depuis le couvercle (32) et une roue dentée (40) fixée coaxialement sur la partie supérieure (38) de l'arbre, une baie présentant une pluralité d'unités d'entraînement (12) espacées verticalement, chaque unité d'entraînement (12) présentant une partie intérieure, une courroie en boucle fermée montée en rotation à l'intérieur (18) de chaque unité d'entraînement (12), la courroie présentant des dents espacées longitudinalement sur un côté, des moyens pour supporter la (les) boîte(s) de peinture sur la baie, disposée(s) côte à côte de telle sorte que la (les) roue(s) dentée(s) est (sont) positionnée(s) dans la partie intérieure de la baie et s'engrène(nt) avec la courroie d'entraînement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/16 (2006.01); B01F 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/1695 (2013.01); B01F 13/1055 (2013.01); Y10S 366/605 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5947598 A 19990907; AT 288786 T 20050215; DE 69923636 D1 20050317; DE 69923636 T2 20060316; EP 0987056 A2 20000322; EP 0987056 A3 20020130; EP 0987056 B1 20050209; FR 2783177 A1 20000317; FR 2783177 B1 20030103

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161014

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161012

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-25 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: DEDOES INDUSTRIES INC; US

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), ASSIGNMENT; FORMER OWNER NAME: AEML

- Effective date: 20161221

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: DEDOES INDUSTRIES, INC., US

- Effective date: 20160927

2016-10-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20160922 AND 20160928

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DEDOES INDUSTRIES INC., WALLED LAKE, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AEML, MEUNG SUR LOIRE, FR

- Document: DE 69923636

2016-06-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69923636

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050709

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AEML

- Effective date: 20050930

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-09-03 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050903

2005-06-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050523

2005-05-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050520

2005-05-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-05-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-05-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69923636 P 20050317

2005-03-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2005-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-02-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-02-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-02-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-02-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 01F 13/10 A

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000622

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI