Global Patent Index - EP 0987066 A2

EP 0987066 A2 2000-03-22 - Cold rolling machine for profiling

Title (en)

Cold rolling machine for profiling

Title (de)

Kaltwalzprofiliermaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à laminer à froid pour profiler

Publication

EP 0987066 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112127 A

Priority

  • DE 29816666 U
  • DE 29817838 U

Abstract (en)

The cold rolling profile machine incorporates shafts (10) for mounting of profiling tools. These shafts are installed in bearings accommodated in bearing boxes (20) which are fixed to the machine frame by fixing units (3). The bearing boxes (20) are made of a plastic material.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kaltwalzprofiliermaschine zur Herstellung von profilierten Werkstücken, mit Werkzeugträgerwellen zur Aufnahme von Profilierwerkzeugen, mit Lagern, in denen die Werkzeugträgerwellen gelagert sind, wobei Lagerschalen vorgesehen sind, in denen die Lager aufgenommen sind und wobei Fixiervorrichtungen vorgesehen sind, mittels derer die Lagerschalen fixierbar sind. Erfindungsgemäß bestehen die Lagerschalen aus Kunststoff. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 31/07; B21D 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/07 (2006.01); B21D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/08 (2013.01); B21B 31/07 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987066 A2 20000322; EP 0987066 A3 20030319

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030920

2003-12-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

2003-12-03 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2003-11-26 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030916

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-05-22 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: JENSEN A/S

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI