Global Patent Index - EP 0987068 A2

EP 0987068 A2 2000-03-22 - Method and device for the extrusion of a hollow section or similar body from bars

Title (en)

Method and device for the extrusion of a hollow section or similar body from bars

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Strangpressen eines Hohlprofils od.dgl. Körpers aus einem Barren sowie Vorrichtung dafür

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'extrusion d'un profil creux ou corps similaires à partir de matériaux en barre

Publication

EP 0987068 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810787 A

Priority

DE 19842291 A

Abstract (en)

The extrusion process produces a hollow strip (12) or similar from a bar taken through a boring and brought to the molding cross section of a molding tool (32) by a press punch. The bar material is taken under pressure into the central input of the molding tool. The ductile mass thus produced is taken outwards at an angle to the pressing direction through several channels to the molding cross section.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Strangpressen eines Hohlprofils (12) od.dgl. Körpers aus einem Barren, der in einer Rezipientenbohrung eines Aufnehmers (18) geführt und mittels eines Pressstempels (16) in Pressrichtung einem Formgebungsquerschnitt eines Formwerkzeuges (32) zugebracht wird, soll der Barrenwerkstoff unter Pressdruck in einen zentralen Einlauf (64) des Formwerkzeuges (32) eingebracht und die dabei entstehende duktile Masse in einem Winkel zur Pressrichtung nach außen durch mehrere Kanäle (66) zum Formgebungsquerschnitt geführt werden. Die Hauptbelastung wird durch den Pressdruck außerhalb des zentralen Einlaufes (64) und des formgebenden Bereiches zugeführt und bevorzugt durch die Presskraft außerhalb des formgebenden Bereiches in Stützwerkzeuge abgeleitet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 23/08; B21C 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 23/08 (2006.01); B21C 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 25/00 (2013.01); B21C 23/08 (2013.01); B21C 33/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987068 A2 20000322; EP 0987068 A3 20010613; EP 0987068 B1 20040609; AT 268650 T 20040615; CA 2281207 A1 20000316; CA 2281207 C 20051115; DE 19842291 A1 20000323; ES 2217720 T3 20041101; NO 318543 B1 20050411; NO 994454 A 20000317; NO 994454 D0 19990914; US 6192730 B1 20010227

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050824

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060904

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070925

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT A.G.

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060904

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060902

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070401

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060902

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060903

2006-09-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060902

2006-09-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060902

2005-10-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-22 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050922

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050824

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050816

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-03-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-12 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217720 T3

2004-09-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-06-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2004-04-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020827

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20011213

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011213

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21C 23/08 A, 7B 21C 25/00 B, 7B 21C 25/02 B

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI