Global Patent Index - EP 0987072 A2

EP 0987072 A2 2000-03-22 - Traction device for use in the manufacturing process of ornamental chains

Title (en)

Traction device for use in the manufacturing process of ornamental chains

Title (de)

Zugvorrichtung zur Verwendung in der Herstellung von Schmuckketten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de traction pour utilisation dans la fabrication de chaînes ornamentales

Publication

EP 0987072 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99830481 A

Priority

IT LU980011 A

Abstract (en)

A device for exerting a traction of a chain (2) getting out of a manufacturing machine, fit to be connected to the chain (2) to keep it in traction with its own weight. The device comprises a drive roller (3), motor means (5) for controlling the rotation of drive roller (3), a movable pushing roller (4), elastic means (9) for keeping pushing roller (4) pushed against drive roller (3) with the interposition of chain (2). As a consequence of the friction between chain (2) and rollers (3, 4), the device is steady with respect to the chain when drive roller (3) is blocked, whereas it slides up with respect to chain (2) when drive roller (3) is rotated by motor means (5). Sensor means are associated to motor means (5) for controlling the rotation of drive roller (3) as a function of the level of the device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21L 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21L 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21L 11/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987072 A2 20000322; EP 0987072 A3 20010808; EP 0987072 B1 20031126; DE 69913061 D1 20040108; DE 69913061 T2 20040902; ES 2211022 T3 20040701; IT 1305926 B1 20010521; IT LU980011 A1 20000320; IT LU980011 D0 19980918

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69913061

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100723

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090728

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090728

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211022 T3

2004-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69913061 P 20040108

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES

2002-06-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011115

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21L 11/00 A, 7B 21L 19/00 B, 7B 66D 5/16 B

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI