Global Patent Index - EP 0987073 A1

EP 0987073 A1 2000-03-22 - Mould wall for a continuous casting machine

Title (en)

Mould wall for a continuous casting machine

Title (de)

Kokillenwand einer Stranggiesskokille

Title (fr)

Paroi pour lingotière de coulée continue

Publication

EP 0987073 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116645 A

Priority

DE 19842674 A

Abstract (en)

Wall of a continuous casting mold comprises a water chamber (2) connected to the mold inner plate (1) using screw connections. The inner plate has spacings (5) on the sides facing the water chamber with channels (6) running between them with filling pieces (7) arranged in them. The channels (6) has undercuts (6') having a thickness (b). The filling pieces have connecting elements (9) of thickness (c) and are attached in the undercuts. The screw connections are arranged between the filling pieces and the water chamber.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Kokillenwand einer Stranggießkokille, die aus einer Kokilleninnenplatte (1) und einem mit der Kokilleninnenplatte (1) über Schraubverbindungen verbundenen Wasserkasten (2) besteht, wobei die Kokilleninnenplatte (1) auf ihrer dem Wasserkasten (2) zugewandten Seite (3) Stege (5) mit dazwischen verlaufenden Nuten (6) mit einer Nutbreite (a) aufweist, in denen Füllstücke (7) angeordnet sind. Um die Kokilleninnenplatte(1) am Wasserkasten (2) zu befestigen, ist vorgesehen, daß die Nuten (6) Hinterschneidungen (6') mit einer Hinterschneidungsdicke (b) aufweisen, daß die Füllstücke (7) Verbindungselemente (9) mit einer Verbindungselementdicke (c) aufweisen, daß die Füllstücke (7) lösbar in die Hinterschneidungen (6') eingreifen und daß die Schraubverbindungen zwischen den Füllstücken (7) und dem Wasserkasten (2) angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/055 (2006.01); B22D 11/057 (2006.01); B22D 11/059 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/055 (2013.01); B22D 11/059 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987073 A1 20000322; DE 19842674 A1 20000323; JP 2000094096 A 20000404; US 6289970 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021031

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990916

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI