Global Patent Index - EP 0987090 A2

EP 0987090 A2 2000-03-22 - Process and device for making a tubular article , in particular a fence

Title (en)

Process and device for making a tubular article , in particular a fence

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines rohrförmigen Körpers, insbesondere einer Palisade

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d'un article tubulaire , en particulier d'une palissade

Publication

EP 0987090 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117088 A

Priority

DE 19842970 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19842970C1] The method of forming a fence post involves forming a hollow body by extrusion, into which a ceramic infill is pressed. Following forming of the base, the walls of the post body are formed, as the ceramic mass is fed into the base form piece and the base. During the operation fluid is fed into the interior of the body. The claims include a machine for forming the post.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines rohrförmigen Körpers mit einem einstückig angeformten Boden, insbesondere einer Palisade, vorgeschlagen, wobei der Körper aus einer plastischen Keramikmasse geformt wird. Das Verfahren weist die folgenden Verfahrensschritte auf: a) Der Körper wird durch Extrusion geformt. b) Zunächst wird der Boden (26) geformt, indem Keramikmasse in ein Bodenformstück (13) gepreßt wird. c) Nach Ausformung des Bodens (26) wird die Wandung des Körpers geformt, indem das Bodenformstück (13) und der Boden (26) in Strömungsrichtung der Keramikmasse verfahren werden. d) Während des Verfahrens des Bodens (26) wird einem im Inneren des Körpers entstehenden Hohlraum (28) ein Fluid zugeführt. Eine auf diese Weise hergestellte Keramikpalisade zeichnet sich durch ihre Witterungs- und Verrottungsbeständigkeit sowie ihre sehr ansprechende Ästhetik aus. Außerdem wird eine Vorrichtung zur Herstellung derartiger rohrförmiger Körper, insbesondere Keramikpalisaden, vorgeschlagen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/2627 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19842970 C1 20000105; EP 0987090 A2 20000322; EP 0987090 A3 20011017

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI