Global Patent Index - EP 0987110 A1

EP 0987110 A1 2000-03-22 - Process for assessing the quality of processed material

Title (en)

Process for assessing the quality of processed material

Title (de)

Verfahren zur qualitativen Beurteilung von bearbeitetem Material

Title (fr)

Procédé pour évaluer la qualité d'un matériau traité

Publication

EP 0987110 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118436 A

Priority

  • DE 19613083 A
  • EP 97920565 A

Abstract (en)

The method for qualitative testing of processed material is carried out using at least one photo electric sensor, working in conjunction with an evaluation unit. Possible fault sources allocated to image regions of the processed e.g. printed material are detected. The material is printed using a rotary printing press. Respectively a print form as a source of error, of a form cylinder provided with several identical printing forms is established. Each source of error is allocated an own counter.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur qualitativen Beurteilung von bearbeiteten Material werden Bildbereiche des inspizierten Materials möglichen Fehlerquellen zugeordnet erfaßt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/14 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); G01N 21/89 (2006.01); G01N 21/892 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19613083 A1 19971009; EP 0892722 A1 19990127; EP 0892722 B1 20011107; EP 0987110 A1 20000322; EP 0987110 B1 20020116; ES 2165605 T3 20020316; ES 2170563 T3 20020801; JP H11507305 A 19990629; US 6333987 B1 20011225; WO 9736749 A1 19971009

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160423

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160423

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160607

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 97080 WUERZBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59706033

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-06-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140609

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130401

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120421

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170563 T3

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59706033 20020221

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020116

2002-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-16 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 892722

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010807

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-03-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 892722

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI