Global Patent Index - EP 0987175 A1

EP 0987175 A1 2000-03-22 - Method of assembly of cabin walls

Title (en)

Method of assembly of cabin walls

Title (de)

Montageverfahren für Wandaufbau von Kabinen

Title (fr)

Procédé de montage de cloisons de cabines

Publication

EP 0987175 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402255 A

Priority

FR 9811661 A

Abstract (en)

The installation process consists of using dummy supports (7) to support the top sections (12A,12) in which the partitions (15) are to be encastred. Once the partitions have been placed and fixed to the top sections, starting from the bathroom unit (S), the dummy is removed by pivoting its posts (8,9) around rotational spindles (13) which enables the placing of the panels to be continued.

Abstract (fr)

Le procédé consiste à utiliser des mannequins supports (7), provisoirement, de façon à supporter les profilés de tête (12A, 12) dans lesquels viennent s'encastrer les panneaux de cloison (15). Une fois quelques panneaux (15) placés et fixés (16) aux profilés de tête (12, 12A), en partant du bloc sanitaire (S), on ôte le mannequin (7) par pivotement de ses poteaux (8, 9) autour d'axes de rotation (13), ce qui permet de poursuivre la pose des panneaux de cloison (15). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/82 (2006.01); B63B 29/02 (2006.01); E04B 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 29/025 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987175 A1 20000322; EP 0987175 B1 20031112; DE 69912708 D1 20031218; DE 69912708 T2 20040923; FR 2783493 A1 20000324; FR 2783493 B1 20001215; JP 2000096743 A 20000404; KR 100623543 B1 20060913; KR 20000023233 A 20000425; US 6192648 B1 20010227

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090915

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080911

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070915

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070915

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070910

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-22 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060822

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040813

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69912708

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM HOLDINGS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI IT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI