Global Patent Index - EP 0987181 A3

EP 0987181 A3 2000-08-16 - Tiltable container

Title (en)

Tiltable container

Title (de)

Kippbehälter

Title (fr)

Récipient basculant

Publication

EP 0987181 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99117472 A

Priority

DE 19842464 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0987181A2] The tilting container (10) has a primary standing surface (24) which extends over more than half the underside of the container, and a secondary standing surface (26) which is at an obtuse angle to the primary one. The primary standing surface extends by more than 5%, preferably by 25%, of the container diameter beyond the center of the container. The secondary standing surface should preferably extend to a height which is about half the container height (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61C 19/00 (2006.01); A61C 13/34 (2006.01); A61C 13/38 (2006.01); B65D 1/02 (2006.01); B65D 1/10 (2006.01); B65D 1/40 (2006.01); B65D 83/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/40 (2013.01); B65D 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987181 A2 20000322; EP 0987181 A3 20000816; CA 2282202 A1 20000316; DE 19842464 A1 20000323; JP 2000085737 A 20000328

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-13 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020920

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010910

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IVOCLAR VIVADENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI