Global Patent Index - EP 0987184 A2

EP 0987184 A2 2000-03-22 - Container for collecting and disposing of hygiene articles

Title (en)

Container for collecting and disposing of hygiene articles

Title (de)

Behältnis zum Sammeln und Entsorgen von Hygienartikeln

Title (fr)

Récipient pour la collecte et l'enlèvement des articles d'hygiene

Publication

EP 0987184 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118266 A

Priority

DE 29816571 U

Abstract (en)

The container (C), for the collection and disposal of sanitary items (A), are disposed of together. The container (C) is a folding carton (K) of corrugated cardboard (P) or cardboard which can be crushed. The upper side has a self-adhesive lid (D) with a lock (H) to hold it closed. The inner and outer surfaces of the carton (K) have a coating (B) for moisture resistance, and especially of an acrylic resin dispersion with added bactericides, fungicides and a perfume, to combat bacteria and fungal growth.

Abstract (de)

Anstelle des üblicherweise für dauernden Einsatz konzipierten Eimers wird ein Behältnis (C) zum Sammeln und Entsorgen benutzter Hygieneartikel (A) vorgeschlagen, das ein mit darin gesammelten Hygieneartikeln (A) gemeinsam entsorgbarer und vernichtbarer Faltkarton (K) aus Wellpappe (P) oder Karton ist, der oberseitig einen selbsthaltenden Deckel (D) mit einem Schließstellungs-Haltemechanismus (H) aufweist und innen- und außenseitig eine feuchtigkeitsfeste und zumindest biozide Beschichtung (B) besitzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/00 (2006.01); B65F 1/16 (2006.01); B65F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/1623 (2013.01); B65F 1/00 (2013.01); B65F 7/00 (2013.01); B65F 2240/164 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29816571 U1 19981126; EP 0987184 A2 20000322; EP 0987184 A3 20010328

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20021102

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020507

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 5/66 A, 7B 65F 1/00 B

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI