Global Patent Index - EP 0987184 A3

EP 0987184 A3 2001-03-28 - Container for collecting and disposing of hygiene articles

Title (en)

Container for collecting and disposing of hygiene articles

Title (de)

Behältnis zum Sammeln und Entsorgen von Hygienartikeln

Title (fr)

Récipient pour la collecte et l'enlèvement des articles d'hygiene

Publication

EP 0987184 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118266 A

Priority

DE 29816571 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0987184A2] The container (C), for the collection and disposal of sanitary items (A), are disposed of together. The container (C) is a folding carton (K) of corrugated cardboard (P) or cardboard which can be crushed. The upper side has a self-adhesive lid (D) with a lock (H) to hold it closed. The inner and outer surfaces of the carton (K) have a coating (B) for moisture resistance, and especially of an acrylic resin dispersion with added bactericides, fungicides and a perfume, to combat bacteria and fungal growth.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/66; B65F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/00 (2006.01); B65F 1/16 (2006.01); B65F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/1623 (2013.01); B65F 1/00 (2013.01); B65F 7/00 (2013.01); B65F 2240/164 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29816571 U1 19981126; EP 0987184 A2 20000322; EP 0987184 A3 20010328

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20021102

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020507

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65D 5/66 A, 7B 65F 1/00 B

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI