Global Patent Index - EP 0987187 A1

EP 0987187 A1 2000-03-22 - Closure cap with seal, method for making the same and assembly comprising a container and the closure with seal

Title (en)

Closure cap with seal, method for making the same and assembly comprising a container and the closure with seal

Title (de)

Verschluss mit Dichtung, Verfahren ihrer Herstellung und Kombination von einem Behälter und diesem Verschluss mit Dichtung

Title (fr)

Bouchon avec joint d'étanchéité, procédé de réalisation d'un tel bouchon et ensemble comprenant un récipient et le dit bouchon avec joint d'étanchéité

Publication

EP 0987187 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402262 A

Priority

FR 9811569 A

Abstract (en)

The plastic screw stopper comprises an internal annular projection (19) which holds a sealing joint (3) floating in a space (29) between the internal surface (20) of the stopper transverse wall and the upper surface (28) of the joint. The joint is deformed during the placing of the stopper on the container neck and the seal (26) is crushed by the free end part of the neck.

Abstract (fr)

Bouchon en matière plastique, à vis, comprenant une saillie annulaire interne (19) permettant le maintien d'un joint d'étanchéité rapporté (3) en position épaulée et flottante dans un espace (29) ménagé entre la face interne (20) de la paroi transversale (12) du bouchon et la face supérieure (28) dudit joint (3). Lors de la mise en place du joint (3), ce dernier est introduit en force pour le passage de la saillie (19). Le joint (3) est déformé, lors de la mise en place du bouchon sur le col du récipient, le bourrelet (26) du joint (3) étant écrasé par la partie extrême libre du col (4) du récipient. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/045 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987187 A1 20000322; CA 2344206 A1 20000323; FR 2783240 A1 20000317; FR 2783240 B1 20001208; US 6581793 B1 20030624; WO 0015517 A1 20000323

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-28 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040225

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030812

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-04-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVEMBAL

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI