Global Patent Index - EP 0987192 A2

EP 0987192 A2 2000-03-22 - Transport unit for insulating panels

Title (en)

Transport unit for insulating panels

Title (de)

Transporteinheit für Dämmstoffplatten

Title (fr)

Unité de transport pour panneaux isolants

Publication

EP 0987192 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115850 A

Priority

DE 19842721 A

Abstract (en)

For the transport of insulation boards (2) to a construction site, especially boards of rock wool, they are assembled into a package (1) for carriage. For the transport of insulation boards (2) to a construction site, especially boards of rock wool, they are assembled into a package (1) for carriage. The surfaces give each board (2) a cube shape. The boards (2) are collected together on a pallet (7) or the like, with their large flat surfaces against each other, with a bonding agent between them for adhesion as an adhesive on a carrier of strips of film, nonwoven, woven material, netting, etc., of filaments and especially of glass or plastics, or fibers of wool, cotton and/or viscose. The boards are coated with a mineral oil, and the like. The package of insulation boards (2) is wrapped with a stretch film.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Transporteinheit (1), bestehend aus einer Anzahl von Dämmstoffplatten (2), insbesondere Mineralwolleplatten, vorzugsweise Steinwolleplatten, die zwei parallel zueinander ausgerichtete große Oberflächen (3) aufweisen, welche Oberflächen (3) rechtwinklig an jeweils zwei Längsflächen (4) und jeweils zwei Querflächen (5) anschließen, so daß jede Dämmstoffplatte (2) quaderförmig ausgebildet ist, wobei die Dämmstoffplatten (2) auf einer Trägereinrichtung (7), beispielsweise einer Palette oder dergleichen derart angeordnet sind, daß benachbarte Dämmstoffplatten (2) mit ihren großen Oberflächen (3) aneinander anliegen. Um eine Transporteinheit (1) zu schaffen, die den Transport einer Vielzahl von Dämmstoffplatten (2) hinsichtlich der herstellerseitigen Verpackung und der baustellenseitigen Bearbeitung im Hinblick auf ökologische und arbeitstechnische Vorgehensweisen vereinfacht, insbesondere hinsichtlich der Verpackungskosten wirtschaftlicher macht, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die auf der Trägereinrichtung (7) angeordneten Dämmstoffplatten (2) miteinander durch zumindest ein Adhäsion erzeugendes Verbindungselement verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/0088 (2013.01); B65D 85/46 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00012 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00092 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987192 A2 20000322; EP 0987192 A3 20001115; EP 0987192 B1 20040414; AT 264231 T 20040415; DE 19842721 A1 20000323

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-02 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20100505

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090812

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090806

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KNAUF INSULATION GMBH

- Effective date: 20050111

2009-05-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KNAUF INSULATION GMBH

- Effective date: 20050111

2005-04-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HERAKLITH AG

- Effective date: 20050111

2005-03-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HERAKLITH AG

- Effective date: 20050111

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909152 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH & CO. OHG

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI