Global Patent Index - EP 0987205 A1

EP 0987205 A1 2000-03-22 - Loop buffer for tape material and its use

Title (en)

Loop buffer for tape material and its use

Title (de)

Schlaufenpuffer für Materialbahn und seine Verwendung

Title (fr)

Accumulateur à boucle pour matériau en bande et son utilisation

Publication

EP 0987205 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117630 A

Priority

DE 19842585 A

Abstract (en)

The loop buffer (16,19) accommodates a loop of moving, flexible material between a delivery section in which the material moves at a delivery speed and an output region in which it moves at a different speed. The storage device has a first traction mechanism (335,55) on the delivery side for pulling the material into it and a separate second traction mechanism (35,56) on the output side for pulling the material into the storage device An Independent claim is also included for an embossing arrangement, esp. a heat embossing arrangement.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Speichereinrichtung zur Aufnahme eines Schlaufenabschnittes einer in einer Transportrichtung (18) bewegten, flexiblen Materialbahn (8) zwischen einem der Speichereinrichtung vorgeschalteten Zufuhrbereich und einem nachgeschalteten Abfuhrbereich beschrieben, wobei sich die Materialbahngeschwindigkeiten im Zufuhrbereich und im Abfuhrbereich mindestens zeitweise unterscheiden. Die Geschwindigkeitsunterschiede werden durch eine Längenveränderung des in der Speichereinrichtung gespeicherten Schlaufenabschnittes kompensiert. Die Speichereinrichtung hat zufuhrseitig eine durch ein Saugband (35,55) gebildete erste Zugeinrichtung und abfuhrseitig eine durch ein paralleles Saugband (35,56) gebildete, gesonderte zweite Zugeinrichtung. Durch die parallelen Saugbänder wird der eingezogene Schlaufenabschnitt auf dem größten Teil seiner Länge durch Unterdruck sicher gehalten, während sich zwischen den Zugeinrichtungen ein zugkraftfreier Schlaufenteilabschnitt (49) entsprechend der Speicherfüllung in Speicherlängsrichtung im wesentlichen ohne Formänderung hin- und herbewegt. Es wird auch eine Heißpräge-Rotationsmaschine beschrieben, in der derartige Speichereinrichtungen besonders vorteilhaft einsetzbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 20/10; B65H 20/24; B65H 20/32; B65H 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/10 (2006.01); B65H 20/32 (2006.01); B65H 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/10 (2013.01); B65H 20/32 (2013.01); B65H 23/042 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4491 (2013.01); B65H 2408/215 (2013.01); Y10S 101/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987205 A1 20000322; EP 0987205 B1 20030618; AT 243157 T 20030715; DE 19842585 A1 20000323; DK 0987205 T3 20031013; ES 2201607 T3 20040316; US 6230616 B1 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160908

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160908

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2013-07-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59905984

2013-07-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59905984

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

2013-07-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59905984

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STEUER, ARMIN

- Free text: STEUER, ARMIN#AM WALDRAND 30#D-71111 WALDENBUCH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- STEUER, ARMIN#AM WALDRAND 30#D-71111 WALDENBUCH (DE)

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070907

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070908

2008-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070908

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070404

2007-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070401

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-04-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2006-10-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060926

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060908

2006-09-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060907

2005-09-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-26 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050922

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STEUER ARMIN

- Effective date: 20030930

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201607 T3

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403620

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-09-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030907

2003-09-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030907

2003-09-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905984 P 20030724

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WERNER FENNER PATENTANWALT

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000826

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI