Global Patent Index - EP 0987210 A3

EP 0987210 A3 2000-09-27 - Drive for a folding blade

Title (en)

Drive for a folding blade

Title (de)

Falzschwertantrieb

Title (fr)

Entraînement pour une lame de pliage

Publication

EP 0987210 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99116575 A

Priority

DE 19842675 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0987210A2] The folding blade drive has a first detection unit (60) with which the blade (10) reaching its top position transmits a first signal to the control unit. A second detection unit (58) is provided with which the blade reaching a bottom position transmits a second signal to a control unit (64) working in conjunction with the folding machine. The control unit switches off at the folding machine if the first or second signal is not given at a previously determined time.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 45/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/18 (2013.01); B65H 2555/10 (2013.01); B65H 2555/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[AD] DE 637535 C 19361030 - GUTBERLET & CO A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987210 A2 20000322; EP 0987210 A3 20000927

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020613

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI