Global patent index - EP 0987215 A2

EP 0987215 A2 2000-03-22 - Fuel dispenser for dispensing liquid fuel

Title (en)

Fuel dispenser for dispensing liquid fuel

Title (de)

Zapfanlage für flüssigen Kraftstoff

Title (fr)

Pompe à essence

Publication

EP 0987215 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99850136 A

Priority

SE 9803150 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel dispenser for a petrol station for dispensing liquid fuel from at least one fuel container comprises at least two fuel containers (1, 2) and at least one delivery nozzle (7, 13). Each delivery nozzle is connected to each of the fuel containers via separate flow control means (6, 9, 11, 12), for controlling a flow of fuel to each delivery nozzle from each of the fuel containers. The fuel dispenser further comprises a flow meter (5, 10) for each delivery nozzle for metering the total flow of fuel to each delivery nozzle from the fuel containers, and at least one flow meter (8) for metering the flow of fuel from a fuel container. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/04 (2010.01); B67D 7/08 (2010.01); B67D 7/74 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/04 (2013.01); B67D 7/08 (2013.01); B67D 7/744 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5630528 A 19970520 - NANAJI SEIFOLLAH S [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987215 A2 20000322; EP 0987215 A3 20000809; SE 517869 C2 20020723; SE 9803150 D0 19980917; SE 9803150 L 20000318

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030812

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI