Global patent index - EP 0987312 A1

EP 0987312 A1 2000-03-22 - Bearing grease composition

Title (en)

Bearing grease composition

Title (de)

Schmierfettzusammensetzung für Lager

Title (fr)

Composition de graisse pour pallier

Publication

EP 0987312 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99115246 A

Priority

JP 27423898 A

Abstract (en)

A bearing grease composition used under clean atmosphere, as in a bearing of hard disc drive, which has small dust generation (scatter), a long life, excellent acoustic performance and low torque. It has been found that especially the bearing grease composition comprising a carbonate having a branched alkyl group of 13 to 15 carbon atoms and a metallic soap shows remarkable characteristics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 169/02; G11B 19/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 105/48 (2006.01); C10M 117/02 (2006.01); C10M 117/04 (2006.01); C10M 169/02 (2006.01); C10N 10/02 (2006.01); C10N 10/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/00 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 40/02 (2006.01); C10N 40/06 (2006.01); C10N 50/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/02 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1245 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1285 (2013.01); C10M 2207/32 (2013.01); C10M 2207/325 (2013.01); C10N 2210/00 (2013.01); C10N 2210/01 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/20 (2013.01); C10N 2240/201 (2013.01); C10N 2240/202 (2013.01); C10N 2240/203 (2013.01); C10N 2240/204 (2013.01); C10N 2240/205 (2013.01); C10N 2240/22 (2013.01); C10N 2240/30 (2013.01); C10N 2240/50 (2013.01); C10N 2240/52 (2013.01); C10N 2240/54 (2013.01); C10N 2240/56 (2013.01); C10N 2240/58 (2013.01); C10N 2240/60 (2013.01); C10N 2240/66 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 169/02 + C10M 105/48 + C10M 117/04

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987312 A1 20000322; EP 0987312 B1 20040616; DE 69918007 D1 20040722; DE 69918007 T2 20050707; JP 2000063874 A 20000229; US 2002111279 A1 20020815; US 2003013622 A1 20030116; US 2005054544 A1 20050310

INPADOC legal status

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080803

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080802

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080802

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080802

2009-04-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050727

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060804

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070808

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070829

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060804

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070807

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070801

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060808

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060802

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050804

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-04-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69918007

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020212

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI