Global Patent Index - EP 0987316 A1

EP 0987316 A1 2000-03-22 - Process for cleaning hard surfaces by using polyaspartic acid in cleaning formulations with abrasive effect

Title (en)

Process for cleaning hard surfaces by using polyaspartic acid in cleaning formulations with abrasive effect

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Reinigung fester Oberflächen durch Verwendung von Polyasparaginsäure in Reinigerformulierungen mit abrasiver Wirkung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le nettoyage de surfaces solides par utilisation d'acide polyasparginique dans des formulations détergentes à effet abrasif

Publication

EP 0987316 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116839 A

Priority

DE 19842053 A

Abstract (en)

Cleaning composition based on sodium bicarbonate contains a dispersant consisting of polyaspartic acid and/or its salts. Preferred Features: The composition contains 20-95 wt.% sodium bicarbonate and 5-15 wt.% dispersant.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft Reinigungsmittel, die als Pulver oder als wäßrige Formulierung Natriumbicarbonat und als Dispergiermittel Polyasparaginsäuren und/oder deren Salze enthalten, die Verwendung dieser Reinigungsmittel zur abrasiven Reinigung fester Oberflächen sowie ein Verfahren zur Reinigung von mit Ablagerungen verunreinigten Oberflächen unter Verwendung dieser Reinigungsmittel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/10; C11D 3/37; C11D 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/32 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 7/12 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3719 (2013.01); C11D 7/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987316 A1 20000322; DE 19842053 A1 20000323; JP 2000087085 A 20000328; US 6245157 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-03-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR CLEANING HARD SURFACES BY USING POLYASPARTIC ACID IN CLEANING FORMULATIONS WITH ABRASIVE EFFECT

2004-01-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR CLEANING HARD SURFACES BY USING POLYASPARTIC ACID IN CLEANING FORMULATIONS WITH ABRASIVE EFFECT

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CHEMICALS AG

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030224

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI