Global Patent Index - EP 0987318 A1

EP 0987318 A1 2000-03-22 - Use of water soluble polymer polycarboxylate in cleaning formula with abrasive effect

Title (en)

Use of water soluble polymer polycarboxylate in cleaning formula with abrasive effect

Title (de)

Verwendung von wasserlöslichen polymeren Polycarboxylaten in Reinigerformulierungen mit abrasiver Wirkung

Title (fr)

Utilisation de polycarboxylate polymérique soluble dans l'eau dans des formulations détergentes à effet abrasif

Publication

EP 0987318 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116838 A

Priority

DE 19842054 A

Abstract (en)

Cleaning agent based on NaHCO3, NaCl and/or sugar together with a water-soluble polymeric polycarboxylate as dispersing agent, a chelating agent and/or a surfactant. Cleaning agent based on Na bicarbonate, Na chloride and/or sugar as carrier which contains in the form of a powder or an aqueous formulation (a) a water-soluble polymeric polycarboxylate (I) as dispersing agent, (b) a chelating agent and/or (c) a surfactant.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft Reinigungsmittel, die als Pulver oder als wäßrige Formulierung auf Basis von Natriumbicarbonat, Natriumchlorid und/oder Zucker a) ein wasserlösliches polymeres Polycarboxylat als Dispergiermittel und/oder, b) einen Chelatbildner und/oder, c) ein Tensid enthalten, mit Ausnahme solcher Mischungen, die nur Natriumbicarbonat und Polyasparaginsäuren und/oder deren Salze enthalten, die Verwendung dieser Reinigungsmittel zur abrasiven Reinigung fester Oberflächen sowie ein Verfahren zur Reinigung von mit Ablagerungen verunreinigten Oberflächen unter Verwendung dieser Reinigungsmittel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37; C11D 3/10; C11D 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/26 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/14 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/33 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 7/10 (2006.01); C11D 7/12 (2006.01); C11D 7/32 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/046 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01); C11D 3/14 (2013.01); C11D 3/221 (2013.01); C11D 3/33 (2013.01); C11D 3/3719 (2013.01); C11D 3/3761 (2013.01); C11D 1/143 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19842054 A1 20000316; CA 2281853 A1 20000315; EP 0987318 A1 20000322; JP 2000096092 A 20000404; US 6524392 B1 20030225

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040422

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CHEMICALS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030225

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI