Global Patent Index - EP 0987319 A3

EP 0987319 A3 2000-03-29 - Liquid cleaning compositions

Title (en)

Liquid cleaning compositions

Title (de)

Flüssige Reinigungszusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Compositions de nettoyage liquides

Publication

EP 0987319 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99124125 A

Priority

  • EP 96924556 A
  • US 130695 P
  • US 130795 P
  • US 130895 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0987319A2] All purpose cleaning or microemulsion compositions contain an anionic surfactant, a hydrocarbon ingredient, a Lewis base neutral polymer, a cosurfactant, and water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37; C11D 1/02; C11D 3/18; C11D 3/20; C11D 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/2068 (2013.01); C11D 1/143 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987319 A2 20000322; EP 0987319 A3 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2001-04-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010216

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DURBUT, PATRICK

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MISSELYN, ANNE-MARIE

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BROZE, GUY

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DURBUT, PATRICK

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MISSELYN, ANNE-MARIE

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BROZE, GUY

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991202

2000-03-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 839177

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE