Global patent index - EP 0987320 A2

EP 0987320 A2 2000-03-22 - Detergent compositions

Title (en)

Detergent compositions

Title (de)

Reinigungsmittel

Title (fr)

Compositions détergentes

Publication

EP 0987320 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99122669 A

Priority

  • EP 90304333 A
  • GB 8909254 A
  • GB 9007271 A

Abstract (en)

A tablet of compressed detergent powder contains the inorganic persalt bleach, sodium perborate, in conjunction with one or more bleach-sensitive ingredients - tetraacetylethylenediamine or similar bleach activator, enzyme, fluorescer, or any combination of these - as well as detergent-active compounds, detergency builders and optionally other ingredients. The persalt is not segregated from the bleach-sensitive ingredients but, surprisingly, the tablet is stable with no more loss of bleach, enzyme or fluorescer performance on storage than in a powder of the same composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39; C11D 3/12; C11D 3/386; C11D 3/42; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/42 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3917 (2013.01); C11D 3/386 (2013.01); C11D 3/38609 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01); C11D 3/42 (2013.01); C11D 17/0086 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2240110 A 19910724; GB 2240110 B 19921118; GB 9007271 D0 19900530; EP 0987320 A2 20000322; EP 0987320 A3 20000705; GB 8909254 D0 19890607; PH 27374 A 19930621; TW 216803 B 19931201; ZA 9003098 B 19911224

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020816

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020130

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991214

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER PLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER PLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 395333

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE