Global Patent Index - EP 0987338 B1

EP 0987338 B1 2003-06-25 - Method for producing welded copper pipes

Title (en)

Method for producing welded copper pipes

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von geschweissten Rohren aus Kupfer

Title (fr)

Procédépour la production de tubes soudés en cuivre

Publication

EP 0987338 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99250159 A

Priority

DE 19843235 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0987338A1] Backspace or cathode material in the melting furnace is melted to a pre-material for the welded pipes and feeding into the casting furnace via a feed channel. Phosphorus is introduced as reductant into the casting furnace or directly into the feed channel to deoxidize the melt to oxygen-free copper. The melt is mixed with the phosphorus in the casting furnace or in the feed channel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 15/00; B21C 37/08; C22B 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 15/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987338 A1 20000322; EP 0987338 B1 20030625; ES 2196718 T3 20031216

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070519

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070521

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070521

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070519

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070519

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070519

2007-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-16 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060516

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196718 T3

2003-11-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906069 P 20030731

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 22B 15/00 A, 7C 22B 15/14 B, 7B 21C 37/08 B

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020327

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FI FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-10-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI