Global patent index - EP 0987352 A2

EP 0987352 A2 2000-03-22 - Modular meltblowing die

Title (en)

Modular meltblowing die

Title (de)

Modulare Schmelzblasdüse

Title (fr)

Matrice modulaire de soufflage à chaud

Publication

EP 0987352 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99118377 A

Priority

US 15390398 A

Abstract (en)

A meltblowing die includes a die tip having an outwardly projecting triangular nosepiece defining an apex therealong, a row of hot melt holes spaced along the apex, and air holes positioned in relation to the hot melt holes to cause at least some of the filaments discharging therefrom to flare outwardly so that the hot melt filaments deposited on an underlying moving substrate has a lateral dimension greater than the length of the row of hot melt holes. The die may be operated to cause t he filaments to be deposited on the substrate in a side-by-side sinusoidal, stitch-like pattern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 4/02; D01D 5/098

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/02 (2006.01); D01D 4/02 (2006.01); D01D 5/098 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/0275 (2013.01); D01D 4/025 (2013.01); D01D 5/0985 (2013.01); B05C 5/0237 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987352 A2 20000322; EP 0987352 A3 20000503

INPADOC legal status

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001104

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI