Global Patent Index - EP 0987352 A3

EP 0987352 A3 2000-05-03 - Modular meltblowing die

Title (en)

Modular meltblowing die

Title (de)

Modulare Schmelzblasdüse

Title (fr)

Matrice modulaire de soufflage à chaud

Publication

EP 0987352 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99118377 A

Priority

US 15390398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0987352A2] A meltblowing die includes a die tip having an outwardly projecting triangular nosepiece defining an apex therealong, a row of hot melt holes spaced along the apex, and air holes positioned in relation to the hot melt holes to cause at least some of the filaments discharging therefrom to flare outwardly so that the hot melt filaments deposited on an underlying moving substrate has a lateral dimension greater than the length of the row of hot melt holes. The die may be operated to cause t he filaments to be deposited on the substrate in a side-by-side sinusoidal, stitch-like pattern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 4/02; D01D 5/098

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/02 (2006.01); D01D 4/02 (2006.01); D01D 5/098 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/0275 (2013.01); D01D 4/025 (2013.01); D01D 5/0985 (2013.01); B05C 5/0237 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987352 A2 20000322; EP 0987352 A3 20000503

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001104

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI