Global patent index - EP 0987353 A1

EP 0987353 A1 2000-03-22 - Polyester fibres and filaments and process for their production

Title (en)

Polyester fibres and filaments and process for their production

Title (de)

Polyesterfasern und -filamente sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung

Title (fr)

Fibres et filaments en polyester et procédé pour les produire

Publication

EP 0987353 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117671 A

Priority

  • DE 19842463 A
  • DE 19935145 A

Abstract (en)

Polyethylene terephthalate contains 0.1-4 wt.% small rod shaped inclusions of polymethyl methacrylate (PMMA) with Mw = 2 x 10<4>-2 x 10<5>. The fibres and filaments are produced with a draw off speed 8000 m/minute. Polyethylene terephthalate (PET) fibres and filaments, produced with a draw off speed 8000 m/minute from PET containing 0.1-4 wt.% polymethyl methacrylate (PMMA) with a weight average molecular weight (Mw) = 2 x 10<4>-2 x 10<5> in the form of small rod shaped inclusions with a lateral particle size 800 nm (measured in extruded, unoriented filaments). An Independent claim is also included for production of PET fibres and filaments by polycondensation of or melting and then melt spinning PMMA modified PET to form unoriented filaments, with the PMMA inclusions.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft Fasern bzw. Filamente aus überwiegend Polyethylenterephthalat als fadenbildendem Polymer, die 0,1 bis 4 Gew.-%, bezogen auf das fadenbildende Polymer, Polymethylmethacrylat als weiteres Polymer, überwiegend in Form von stäbchenförmigen Einlagerungen, enthalten, wobei in den unorientierten Schmelzefäden unter der Spinndüse der mittlere laterale Durchmesser der Stäbchen weniger als 800 nm beträgt und das Polymethylmethacrylat ein gewichtsmäßig mittleres Molekulargewicht von zwischen 20.000 und 200.000 g/mol aufweist, und wobei die Abzugsgeschwindigkeit der Spinnfäden bei der Herstellung bis zu 8.000 m/min beträgt. Die Erfindung betrifft weiterhin ein Verfahren zur Herstellung dieser neuartigen Polyesterfasern und -filamente.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/92

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/62 (2006.01); D01F 6/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/92 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2913 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2969 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987353 A1 20000322; EP 0987353 B1 20031105; BR 9904204 A 20000905; CN 1159475 C 20040728; CN 1260411 A 20000719; ES 2210929 T3 20040701; ID 23998 A 20000614; KR 20000023034 A 20000425; MX PA99008258 A 20041126; TR 9902159 A2 20000821; TR 9902159 A3 20000821; TW 490513 B 20020611; US 6235389 B1 20010522; US 6544456 B1 20030408

INPADOC legal status

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080907

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060908

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060908

2007-09-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060907

2006-03-29 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20051104

2005-09-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-20 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050920

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ZIMMER A.G.

- Effective date: 20040626

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2210929

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907609

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IE IT

2003-08-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROEHM GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020814

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IE IT

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IE IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI