Global patent index - EP 0987364 A3

EP 0987364 A3 2000-07-19 - Sealing device and process for sealing pressure zones in a papermachine

Title (en)

Sealing device and process for sealing pressure zones in a papermachine

Title (de)

Dichtungseinrichtung und Verfahren zur Abdichtung von Druckzonen in einer Papiermaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'étanchéité et procédé pour étanchéifier des zones de pression dans une machine à papier

Publication

EP 0987364 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111864 A

Priority

DE 19842837 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0987364A2] The sealing for the sides of at least one over- or under pressure zone (P1,P2), at a moving surface (20) in a papermaking machine, has a limit unit (70) at a gap from the moving surface (20) to define the laying movement of the seal (15) at the surface (20). The laid seal (15) can be moved against the pressure force in relation to the limit (70) and the holder (10). The limit (70) has a grip section (75) in a cut-back structure (16) of the seal (15) and especially a groove. The seal (15) can move in relation to the limit grip (75) between two surfaces (16a,16b) of the groove structure (16). The limit (70) is coupled firmly to the holder (10), or is pressed into the holder (10) in a clamped fit between the holder (10) and a clamp (30). The clamp (30) is a pressure hose, preferably between the seal (15) and a carrier (80) for the holder (10), within a groove (45) in the carrier (80). A moving piston (60) is in the groove (45), between the clamping pressure hose (50) and the limit (70). The limit (70) can move in relation to the holder (10), against a return pressure, especially through contact with a surface (16a) at the seal (15). The return pressure on the limit (70) is through a pull or push spring (35) at the holder (10) and especially at the holder carrier (80). The seal (15) is moved against the moving surface (20) by at least one pressure hose (55), especially between the seal (15) and a surface of the holding zone (17) away from the moving surface (20). The seal (15) has a layer (15a) towards the moving surface (20) as a wear surface, in a different material from the body of the seal (15). The seal (15) is a sealing bar over the length of the moving surface (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987364 A2 20000322; EP 0987364 A3 20000719; EP 0987364 B1 20040317; DE 19842837 A1 20000323; US 6312564 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090622

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090621

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080612

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-06-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908859

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-07-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SEALING DEVICE FOR SEALING PRESSURE ZONES IN A PAPERMACHINE

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030123

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI