Global patent index - EP 0987365 A2

EP 0987365 A2 2000-03-22 - Sealing device and process for sealing pressure zones in a papermachine

Title (en)

Sealing device and process for sealing pressure zones in a papermachine

Title (de)

Dichtungseinrichtung und Verfahren zur Abdichtung von Druckzonen in einer Papiermaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'étanchéité et procédé pour étanchéifier des zones de pression dans une machine à papier

Publication

EP 0987365 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114588 A

Priority

DE 19842838 A

Abstract (en)

The sealing for the sides of at least one over- or under pressure zone (P1,P2), at a moving surface (20) in a papermaking machine has at least one seal (15) at a holding zone (17) of a holder (10) with movement in relation to the holder to bear against the moving surface (20). The holding zone (17) is a clamp holder, where the seal (15) is held by a clamping force through clamping surfaces. The holding zone (17) is generally filled on at least one plane at right angles to the alignment direction of the seal (15). The holding zone is an open channel (17) towards the moving surface (20), with a free square or rectangular cross section surface, and the side walls are the clamping surfaces. At least one clamping surface is formed in part by a clamp unit (130), preferably in a groove (45) in a side wall (11,12) of the holder (10), open towards the seal (15). The clamp (130) acts as a seal, and has elastic distortion with a clamp pressure hose (50). The seal (15) is supported by a pressure hose at the holding zone (17), to press the seal against the moving surface (20). The pressure levels in the support (55) and clamp (50) hoses are equal while the seal (15) is presented to and pressed against the moving surface (20). The pressure hoses (50) are linked to a common pressure source. A moving piston (60) is in the grooves (45) at the side walls (11,12) of the holder (10), between the clamping pressure hoses (50) and the seal (15). The piston (60) is of a material with low elasticity. The surface of the seal (15) towards the moving surface (20) is a wear layer, and the lower end of the seal (15) is a clamping section. The wear layer and clamping section are of different materials from the body of the seal (15). The holder (10) is moved to the moving surface (20) with a unit parallel to the laying direction, and is mounted to a suction/blower box and especially in a spring mounting. The clamping force is set according to the gap between the seal (15) and the moving surface (20) and/or according to the pressure in laying the seal (15) against the moving surface (20). When the seal (15) is in contact with the moving surface (20), the press force on it is set according to the ratio between the clamping force and the bending force to fit the seal (15) to the contour of the moving surface (20). The press force on the seal (15) is reduced down to zero after it comes into contact with the moving surface (20). The clamping force is greater or less than the bending force, and the press force can be reduced to a level which is the difference between the clamping and bending forces.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Dichtungseinrichtung zur seitlichen Abdichtung wenigstens einer an eine bewegte Fläche (20) angrenzenden Überdruck- oder Unterdruckzone (P1, P2) in einer Papiermaschine mit wenigstens einem Dichtelement (15), das zumindest bereichsweise in einem Aufnahmebereich (17) eines Halters (10) angeordnet und zum Anlegen an die bewegte Fläche (20) relativ zum Halter (10) bewegbar ist, wobei der Aufnahmebereich (17) als Klemmaufnahme ausgebildet und das Dichtelement (15) über Klemmflächen der Klemmaufnahme mit einer Klemmkraft (FR) beaufschlagt ist. Die Erfindung betrifft des weiteren ein Verfahren zur Abdichtung von Druckzonen (P1, P2) in einer Papiermaschine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/10 (2013.01); Y10S 277/906 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987365 A2 20000322; EP 0987365 A3 20000719; EP 0987365 B1 20040616; DE 19842838 A1 20000323; US 2002060030 A1 20020523; US 6334934 B1 20020101; US 6551460 B2 20030422

INPADOC legal status

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140727

2015-05-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59909733

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140726

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-03-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59909733

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130711

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050317

2004-08-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909733

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-06-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HEINZMANN, HELMUT

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030123

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI