Global Patent Index - EP 0987366 A3

EP 0987366 A3 2000-04-05 - Press felt with improved drainage

Title (en)

Press felt with improved drainage

Title (de)

Pressfilz mit verbesserter Entwasserung

Title (fr)

Feutre de presse à essorage amélioré

Publication

EP 0987366 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99117832 A

Priority

US 15219498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0987366A2] A three layer papermaking press section press felt in which the first layer comprises a core fabric which contains the mechanical loads placed upon the press felt, the second layer comprises a layer of absorbent material, typically a batt needle punched onto the core fabric, and the third layer comprises a porous layer attached to the surface of the absorbent layer. The third layer receives the wet paper web. The three layer press felts remove from about 3% to at least about 5% more water from the wet paper web under pressure in a press section in comparison with the same press felt to which the third porous layer has not been added. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/00 (2006.01); D21F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/0063 (2013.01); D21F 7/083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987366 A2 20000322; EP 0987366 A3 20000405; CA 2282053 A1 20000314

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020403

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI