Global patent index - EP 0987379 A2

EP 0987379 A2 2000-03-22 - Device for securing roof covering elements on a roof construction and method for mounting thereof

Title (en)

Device for securing roof covering elements on a roof construction and method for mounting thereof

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Dacheindeckungselements auf einem Dachunterbau und Methode dafür

Title (fr)

Dispositif de montage d'un élément de toiture sur une charpente de toit et méthode relative

Publication

EP 0987379 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99203012 A

Priority

NL 1010107 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a device for securing one or more roof covering elements on a roof construction, comprising: a hook-shaped part (10-13) for engaging on an edge of a roof covering element; a body part which connects onto the hook part and which is provided with a resilient piece (14); and a fixing part (16) which extends substantially transversely of the body part and which is provided with a backward pointing piercing part for fixing in a component of the roof construction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/34 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3411 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3461 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3473 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987379 A2 20000322; EP 0987379 A3 20000329; EP 0987379 B1 20060125; DE 69929563 D1 20060413; DE 69929563 T2 20060824; NL 1010107 C2 20000324

INPADOC legal status

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060916

2008-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ETERNIT B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060916

2007-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070401

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060916

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2007-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2007-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061026

2006-09-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060928

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69929563

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-04-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB LU NL

2006-01-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030617

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE GB LU NL

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB LU NL

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI