Global patent index - EP 0987380 A1

EP 0987380 A1 2000-03-22 - Sealing device for a roof terminal through a flat roof

Title (en)

Sealing device for a roof terminal through a flat roof

Title (de)

Abdichtungselement zur Flachdachdurchführung

Title (fr)

Elément d'étanchéité pour sortie d'une toiture plane

Publication

EP 0987380 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202968 A

Priority

NL 1010129 A

Abstract (en)

Sealing device for a roof terminal, such as a flue gas discharge pipe or a ventilation pipe, comprising a disc-shaped placement member (2), provided with a passage opening (14) for the roof terminal, and attached to the placement member (2) at the location of the passage opening (14) a sealing annulus or sealing ring (4) extending in the passage opening (14), made from flexible material for sealingly abutting the roof terminal, the annulus or ring (4) being attached in the edge of the passage opening (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/14; F16L 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/14 (2006.01); E04D 13/147 (2006.01); F16L 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1476 (2013.01); E04D 13/1407 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987380 A1 20000322; EP 0987380 B1 20080903; DE 69939447 D1 20081016; NL 1010129 C2 20000324

INPADOC legal status

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090914

2010-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090914

2010-04-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: UBBINK B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-08-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090604

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081208

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69939447

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-10-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2008-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2008-04-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SNIJDERS, LEONARDUS JOHANNES ANTONIUS

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030425

2005-05-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UBBINK B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-04-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UBBINK B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030425

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB NL

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI