Global Patent Index - EP 0987385 A3

EP 0987385 A3 2001-01-17 - Inflatable tent

Title (en)

Inflatable tent

Title (de)

Aufblasbares Zelt

Title (fr)

Tente gonflable

Publication

EP 0987385 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99112890 A

Priority

DE 19842887 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0987385A2] The inflatable tent has a roof (20) and side walls (22,24) of folding tarpaulin materials. The support structure is of inflatable tube hoses (28,30,32) to carry the roof and walls. Ballast tanks (34) are along the bottom edges of at least some side walls (22,24), to be filled with water and hold the tent to the ground by their weight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/20 (2013.01); E04H 2015/201 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987385 A2 20000322; EP 0987385 A3 20010117; EP 0987385 B1 20041006; DE 19842887 A1 20000323

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-04-30 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 20091229

2009-11-06 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-07-31 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2007-04-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MANFRED VETTER VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRA

- Effective date: 20070116

2007-04-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: VETTER GMBH

2007-02-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050115

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910724 P 20041111

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030729

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI