Global Patent Index - EP 0987388 A1

EP 0987388 A1 2000-03-22 - Security lock

Title (en)

Security lock

Title (de)

Sicherheitsverschluss

Title (fr)

Serrure de sécurité

Publication

EP 0987388 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98117397 A

Priority

EP 98117397 A

Abstract (en)

The security lock has a sliding bolt (2) moving between two positions, and which can be locked in place in at least one of the two positions (26,27). The lock has at least two security conditions to lock the bolt. In the first place, the bolt is free to slide and its movement is blocked in the second place. After the bolt has been released, it switches from the first to the second condition.

Abstract (de)

Um einen Sicherheitsverschluß anzugeben, der für Gehäuse, Behälter, Magazine und dergleichen verwendbar ist, also möglichst einfach und leicht und mit geringem wirtschaftlichen Aufwand herstellbar, wenig anfällig und nicht manipulierbar einsetzbar ist und darüber hinaus neben dem ungehindertem autorisierten Öffnen auch ein zumindest einmaliges Öffnen in einer vorherbestimmten Einbausituation oder Bediensituation zuläßt, wird vorgeschlagen, ein Sicherheitsverschluß mit einem zwischen zwei Positionen längsverschiebbaren, in wenigstens einer Position sicherbaren Riegelelement (2) und einem Schloß mit wenigstens zwei Sicherungszuständen zur Sicherung des Riegelelements (2), wobei in einem ersten Sicherungszustand das Riegelelement (2) entsicherbar und längsverschiebbar ist und in einem zweiten Sicherungszustand des Schlosses das Riegelelement gegen Längsverschiebung gesperrt ist, wobei das Schloß nach einmaliger Entsicherung des Riegelementes (2) vom ersten in den zweiten Sicherungszustand umschaltet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 35/08; E05B 55/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 35/04 (2006.01); E05B 35/08 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05B 35/00 (2006.01); E05B 55/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/0065 (2013.01); E05B 35/08 (2013.01); E05B 35/008 (2013.01); E05B 55/00 (2013.01); E05B 2063/207 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987388 A1 20000322; EP 0987388 B1 20030730; DE 59809164 D1 20030904

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59809164

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141007

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090914

2010-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-04-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHEIDT & BACHMANN G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081001

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59809164

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR LU NL

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020418

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR LU NL

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR LU NL

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI