Global patent index - EP 0987394 A2

EP 0987394 A2 2000-03-22 - Hinge

Title (en)

Hinge

Title (de)

Scharnier

Title (fr)

Charnière

Publication

EP 0987394 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118247 A

Priority

DE 29816727 U

Abstract (en)

The furniture hinge has a leaf spring (10) with a fixed end (9) inserted into a slit (8) near the base of the side wall (5) of a pot-shaped swivel hinge part of the hinge arm (1). The leaf spring has an aperture holding a stud or projection of the base (7) of the pot-shaped hinge part. The hinge arm is slidingly supported by a tongue enclosing the articulated axis (3) or by a cam on the resilient end of the leaf spring which lies in a cut-out section (14) of the hinge part. The fixed end of the leaf spring can engage under a tongue, and be supported with a step on the edge of the base formed by a free-cut in the tongue.

Abstract (de)

Ein Scharnier, vorzugsweise ein Möbelscharnier, besteht aus einem Scharnierarm (1), der auf einer in einem topfförmigen verschwenkbaren Scharnierteil (4) unverschieblich gelagerten Gelenkachse (3) schwenkbar gelagert und mit einer die Gelenkachse (3) überragenden Zunge (15) versehen ist, die auf einer mit einem Endbereich (9) am schwenkbaren Scharnierteil (4) gehalterten und im Schließbereich ein Schließmoment erzeugenden Blattfeder (10) gleitet. Um die Blattfeder (10) in einfacher Weise befestigen zu können, ist das festgehaltene Ende (9) der Blattfeder (10) in einen bodennahen Schlitz (8) der Seitenwand (5) des topfförmigen Scharnierteils (4) eingesteckt. Die Blattfeder (10) faßt mit einem Durchbruch (11) einen Noppen (12) des Bodens (7) des topfförmigen Scharnierteils (4) ein. Der Scharnierarm (1) stützt sich durch eine aus seinem eingerollten, die Gelenkachse einfassenden Ende (2) herausgebogene Zunge (15) auf dem federnden Ende (13) der Blattfeder (10) gleitend ab, das in einem Ausschnitt (14) des Bodens (7) des topfförmigen Scharnierteils (4) liegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 11/10; E05F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/00 (2006.01); E05D 3/02 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01); E05D 11/10 (2006.01); E05F 1/08 (2006.01); E05F 1/10 (2006.01); F16C 11/04 (2006.01); E05F 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0415 (2013.01); E05D 11/1014 (2013.01); E05D 11/105 (2013.01); E05D 2007/0484 (2013.01); E05F 1/1284 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53826 (2013.01); Y10T 16/54029 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29816727 U1 19981224; AT 242398 T 20030615; BR 9906058 A 20001128; CN 1083049 C 20020417; CN 1250131 A 20000412; CZ 297918 B6 20070425; CZ 9903178 A3 20000412; EP 0987394 A2 20000322; EP 0987394 A3 20000628; EP 0987394 B1 20030604; ES 2201609 T3 20040316; HK 1026725 A1 20021220; HU 220053 B 20011028; HU 9902856 A1 20001228; HU 9902856 D0 19991028; JP 2000145752 A 20000526; JP 3350487 B2 20021125; KR 100398806 B1 20030919; KR 20000023018 A 20000425; PL 192907 B1 20061229; PL 335358 A1 20000327; TW 392029 B 20000601; US 6360401 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20160607

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110915

2013-06-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130605

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2201609

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905809

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: SI

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES IT

2001-03-14 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19990914

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990914

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990914