Global Patent Index - EP 0987394 A3

EP 0987394 A3 2000-06-28 - Hinge

Title (en)

Hinge

Title (de)

Scharnier

Title (fr)

Charnière

Publication

EP 0987394 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118247 A

Priority

DE 29816727 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ297918B6] In the present invention, there is disclosed a door pivot hinge, particularly a furniture pivot hinge comprising an arm (1) pivoted on a joint axis (3), mounted fixedly on a dish-like rotary part (4), and provided with a tongue (15) extending over the joint axis (3) or with a cam or a finger being non-concentric to the joint axis or a measuring notch, which slide on a leaf spring mounted by its one end portion on the joint (5) rotary portion (5), and creating a closing moment within a closing region. Said leaf spring (10) fixed end (9) is inserted into a groove (8) of a sidewall (5) of the joint dish-like rotary part (4) at lower portion thereof wherein the leaf spring (10) encompasses with an opening (11) a recess (12) or a projection of a lower portion (7) of the dish-like rotary part (4) and the joint arm (1) is slidably supported on the leaf spring (10) elastic end (13) by a tongue (5) or a cam bent from its cylindrical end encompassing the joint axis (3), the elastic end of which is located in a section (14) of the joint dish-like rotary part (4) lower portion (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 11/10; E05F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/00 (2006.01); E05D 3/02 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01); E05D 11/10 (2006.01); E05F 1/08 (2006.01); E05F 1/10 (2006.01); F16C 11/04 (2006.01); E05F 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0415 (2013.01); E05D 11/1014 (2013.01); E05D 11/105 (2013.01); E05D 2007/0484 (2013.01); E05F 1/1284 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53826 (2013.01); Y10T 16/54029 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29816727 U1 19981224; AT 242398 T 20030615; BR 9906058 A 20001128; CN 1083049 C 20020417; CN 1250131 A 20000412; CZ 297918 B6 20070425; CZ 9903178 A3 20000412; EP 0987394 A2 20000322; EP 0987394 A3 20000628; EP 0987394 B1 20030604; ES 2201609 T3 20040316; HK 1026725 A1 20021220; HU 220053 B 20011028; HU 9902856 A1 20001228; HU 9902856 D0 19991028; JP 2000145752 A 20000526; JP 3350487 B2 20021125; KR 100398806 B1 20030919; KR 20000023018 A 20000425; PL 192907 B1 20061229; PL 335358 A1 20000327; TW 392029 B 20000601; US 6360401 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20160607

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110915

2013-06-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130605

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201609 T3

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905809 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES IT

2001-03-14 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990914

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990914

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990914