Global patent index - EP 0987397 A2

EP 0987397 A2 2000-03-22 - Fire resistant element for closing off a room

Title (en)

Fire resistant element for closing off a room

Title (de)

Feuerbeständiges Element zum Abschliessen eines Raumes

Title (fr)

Element résistant au feu pour la fermeture d'un local

Publication

EP 0987397 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 99402268 A

Priority

DE 19842327 A

Abstract (en)

The fire resistant wall (2) has a window provided with a firebreak glass pane (1). The firebreak glass is pre-stressed with the properties of a safety glass. In its butt surfaces (4) it is immediately joined to the splaying surface (3) of the neighboring wall to form a sealed joint. It is supported on a support arm (15) by fixings (7) which are introduced through holes (6) in the glass. The fixings are provided with articulations (11,12) which stay with the window bulge in the event of fire.

Abstract (fr)

Une paroi résistant au feu (2) présente une fenêtre pourvue d'une vitre coupe-feu (1). La vitre coupe-feu (1) est une vitre monolithique en verre précontraint avec les propriétés d'un verre de sécurité. A ses faces d'about (4) elle est immédiatement jointive à la face de l'ébrasement (3) de la partie de mur voisine, en formant un joint étroit. Elle est supportée sur des bras de soutien (15), par des dispositifs de fixation (7), qui sont introduits dans des trous (6) dans la vitre (1). Les dispositifs de fixation (7) sont pourvus d'articulations (11, 12), qui accompagnent les bombements de la vitre (1), en cas d'incendie. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 5/16; E06B 3/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/94 (2006.01); A62C 2/00 (2006.01); A62C 2/06 (2006.01); E06B 3/54 (2006.01); E06B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/5436 (2013.01); E06B 3/5445 (2013.01); E06B 3/5427 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987397 A2 20000322; EP 0987397 A3 20001011; DE 19842327 A1 20000406; DE 19842327 B4 20060713; JP 2000096941 A 20000404; KR 100616322 B1 20060828; KR 20000023130 A 20000425; US 2002043034 A1 20020418; US 6574929 B2 20030610

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050607

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030904

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010320

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI