Global patent index - EP 0987406 A1

EP 0987406 A1 2000-03-22 - Driving method for an electromagnetic valve actuator

Title (en)

Driving method for an electromagnetic valve actuator

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines elektromagnetischen Aktuators zur Betätigung eines Gaswechselventils

Title (fr)

Méthode de commande d'un actionneur de soupape éléctromagnetique

Publication

EP 0987406 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117396 A

Priority

DE 19843073 A

Abstract (en)

The operating method is carried out so that the acceleration curve (a) of the exchange valve (5) is determined using an acceleration sensor (4). The power supply to the solenoids (2,3) securing the armature (1), is controlled depending on the acceleration curve of the gas exchange valve. The position (X) of the gas exchange valve is determined from the acceleration curve of the gas exchange valve.

Abstract (de)

Bei bekannten elektromagnetischen Aktuatoren mit jeweils auf einen Anker wirkenden Elektromagneten können betriebsbedingte Schwankungen von Systemparametern zu einer Fehlfunktion sowie zu einem erhöhten Verschleiß des Aktuators führen. Das neue Verfahren soll einen sicheren Dauerbetrieb ermöglichen. Erfindungsgemäß wird mittels eines Beschleunigungssensors der Beschleunigungsverlauf des Gaswechselventils erfaßt wird und die Energiezufuhr zu dem den Anker fangenden Elektromagneten in Abhängigkeit des Beschleunigungsverlaufs des Gaswechselventils gesteuert. Auf diese Weise lassen sich durch Störgrößen bedingte Verluste an kinetischer Energie kompensieren, so daß der Anker auf den ihn fangenden Elektromagneten mit einer vorgegebenen Geschwindigkeit auftrifft. Betätigung von Gaswechselventilen in Brennkraftmaschinen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/16 (2006.01); F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 19735375 C1 19980702 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
  • [AP] EP 0916815 A2 19990519 - FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]
  • [A] "ELECTROMAGNETIC EUGINE VALVE ACTUATOR WITH LOW SEATING VELOCITY", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE,GB,INDUSTRIAL OPPORTUNITIES LTD. HAVANT, no. 352, pages 518, XP000395246, ISSN: 0374-4353

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987406 A1 20000322; DE 19843073 C1 20000531; JP 2000161092 A 20000613; US 6152094 A 20001128

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030124

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI