Global patent index - EP 0987408 A2

EP 0987408 A2 2000-03-22 - Method of operation of an internal combustion engine with sulphur accumulating exhaust gas purification components and an internal combustion engine operable therewith

Title (en)

Method of operation of an internal combustion engine with sulphur accumulating exhaust gas purification components and an internal combustion engine operable therewith

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Verbrennungsmotoranlage mit schwefelanreichernder Abgasreiningungskomponete und damit betreibbare Verbrennungsmotoranlage

Title (fr)

Procédé de fonctionnement d'un moteur à combustion interne avec composants de purification de gaz d'échappement accumulant de soufre et un moteur à combustion interne fonctionnant avec ce procédé

Publication

EP 0987408 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114565 A

Priority

DE 19842625 A

Abstract (en)

The method of operation includes the operation of the IC engine system so that at specified times a desulfurizing mode is introduced. The operation of the IC engine system is introduced respectively in connection with a cold start activating of the IC engine, before the transition in a normal operating mode.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Verbrennungsmotoranlage mit einem Verbrennungsmotor mit zugehörigem Abgasstrang, einer im Abgasstrang angeordneten, schwefelanreichernden Abgasreinigungskomponente und Mitteln zur Desulfatisierung dieser Abgasreinigungskomponente, wobei der Anlagenbetrieb zu vorgebbaren Zeitpunkten auf einen Desulfatisierungsmodus eingestellt wird, sowie auf eine dergestalt betreibbare Verbrennungsmotoranlage. Erfindungsgemäß wird der Betrieb der Anlage jeweils im Anschluß an eine Kaltstartaktivierung des Verbrennungsmotors vor Übergang in einen Normalbetriebsmodus auf den Desulfatisierungsmodus eingestellt. Eine erfindungsgemäße Motoranlage beinhaltet je einen eigenen Sekundärluftzufuhrzweig für wenigstens zwei seriell geschaltete, schwefelanreichernde Abgasreinigungseinheiten und/oder je einen eigenen Sekundärluftzufuhrzweig für die schwefelanreichernde Abgasreinigungskomponente und eine stromabwärts davon angeordnete Oxidationskatalysatoreinheit. Verwendung beispielsweise in Automobilen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/20; F01N 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/08 (2006.01); F01N 3/22 (2006.01); F01N 3/30 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F01N 13/02 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/222 (2013.01); F01N 3/0814 (2013.01); F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F01N 3/0878 (2013.01); F01N 3/0885 (2013.01); F01N 3/22 (2013.01); F01N 3/30 (2013.01); F01N 13/009 (2014.06); F01N 13/0093 (2014.06); F02D 41/028 (2013.01); F02D 41/064 (2013.01); F01N 2570/04 (2013.01); F01N 2570/14 (2013.01); F01N 2900/1612 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987408 A2 20000322; EP 0987408 A3 20030108; EP 0987408 B1 20040908; DE 19842625 A1 20000330; DE 19842625 C2 20030327; US 6293094 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050724

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-07-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050724

2005-07-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050724

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910440

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD OF OPERATION OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH SULPHUR ACCUMULATING EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION COMPONENTS AND AN

2004-02-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD OF OPERATION OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH SULPHUR ACCUMULATING EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION COMPONENTS AND AN

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 01N 3/08 A, 7F 01N 3/22 B, 7F 02D 41/02 B

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI