Global Patent Index - EP 0987410 A3

EP 0987410 A3 2000-11-15 - Cooling device for v-type internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Cooling device for v-type internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kühlungsvorrichtung für eine V-Typ Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de refroidisssement pour un moteur à combustion interne en V

Publication

EP 0987410 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99118210 A

Priority

JP 26069798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0987410A2] Object: To provide a cooling device for a V-type internal combustion engine, which is capable of sequentially supplying cooling water having been discharged from a water pump to water jackets of first and second banks and to a radiator by way of relatively inconspicuous water pipes. Solving Means: A discharge pipe 76 of a water pump 62 is communicated to a water jacket 241 of a first bank 41; a lower portion of the water jacket 241 of the first bank 41 is communicated to a lower portion of a water jacket 242 of a second bank 42 via a lower communication water pipe 773; an upper portion of the water jacket 241 of the first bank 41 is communicated via an upper communication water pipe 774 to a combined chamber 80 which is formed in the second bank 42 and connected to an upper portion of the water jacket 242 of the second bank 42; and the lower and upper communication water pipes 773, 774 are disposed in a valley portion 28 between the both banks 41 and 42. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 3/02; F01P 11/04; F02B 75/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/02 (2006.01); F01P 11/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/02 (2013.01); F01P 11/04 (2013.01); F02B 75/22 (2013.01); F01P 2003/021 (2013.01); F02B 2275/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0420067 A1 19910403 - MAZDA MOTOR [JP]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 257 (M - 513) 3 September 1986 (1986-09-03)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 06 30 April 1998 (1998-04-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987410 A2 20000322; EP 0987410 A3 20001115; EP 0987410 B1 20030305; CN 1088501 C 20020731; CN 1247935 A 20000322; DE 69905667 D1 20030410; DE 69905667 T2 20030925; JP 2000087743 A 20000328; JP 4057714 B2 20080305

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140913

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130910

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69905667

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110922

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110907

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-10-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905667 P 20030410

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI