Global Patent Index - EP 0987411 A2

EP 0987411 A2 2000-03-22 - Level detection in the cooling water circuit of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Level detection in the cooling water circuit of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Füllstandserkennung im Kühlwasserkreislauf eines Verbrennungsmotors

Title (fr)

Détection de niveau dans un circuit de refroidissement par eau d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0987411 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117751 A

Priority

DE 19842167 A

Abstract (en)

A procedure for recognizing the water fill state in the cooling water circuit of an IC engine for cars in which an electric motor is used to drive the water pump, is described. The current consumption of the electric motor driving the water pump is determined. The value of the current drawn by the electric motor is compared with one or more specified setpoint values and if less than, the same as or more than a setpoint value, a signal is generated. The value of the current drawn by the electric motor is compared with a given minimum value and if less than the minimum value, an alarm signal is released.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Erkennung des Wasserfüllstandes im Kühlwasserkreislauf eines Verbrennungsmotors für Kraftfahrzeuge, in dem ein Elektromotor zum Antrieb der Wasserpumpe verwendet wird, wobei die Stromaufnahme des die Wasserpumpe antreibenden Elektromotors ermittelt und mit einem oder mehreren vorgegebenen, verschiedenen Wasserfüllständen entsprechenden Sollwerten verglichen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/18 (2006.01); F01P 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/18 (2013.01); F01P 2005/125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19842167 A1 20000316; EP 0987411 A2 20000322; EP 0987411 A3 20020306; US 6272923 B1 20010814

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020907

2003-01-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PIERBURG GMBH

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PIERBURG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI