Global Patent Index - EP 0987413 A3

EP 0987413 A3 2000-12-13 - V-type internal combustion engine for motorcycle

Title (en)

V-type internal combustion engine for motorcycle

Title (de)

Motorradbrennkraftmaschine in V-Bauart

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne à cylindres en V pour un motocycle

Publication

EP 0987413 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99116636 A

Priority

JP 26070498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0987413A2] Object: To provide a V-type internal combustion engine for a motorcycle, which is intended to realize a reasonable arrangement of a lubricating oil pump and a cooling water pump for making the rear portion of a crank case compact while suppressing enlargement of the entire engine, and sufficiently ensuring a gap between the rear portion of the crank case and a rear exhaust pipe thereby reducing the adverse effect of radiation heat produced by the exhaust pipe exerted on the crank case. Solving Means: A lubricating oil pump 57 for supplying oil to portions to be lubricated of a front bank 41 and a rear bank 42, and a cooling water pump 62 for supplying cooling water to water jackets 241 and 242 of the front and rear banks 41 and 42 are disposed in front of and over a crank shaft 15, to thereby make a rear portion of a crank case 21 compact and to sufficiently ensure a gap between the rear portion of the crank case and a rear exhaust pipe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 75/22; F02B 61/02; F02B 67/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62M 7/02 (2006.01); F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F02B 61/02 (2006.01); F02B 67/00 (2006.01); F02B 67/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/22 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/22 (2013.01); F02B 61/02 (2013.01); F02B 67/04 (2013.01); F01M 1/02 (2013.01); F02B 2075/027 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1808 (2013.01); F02B 2275/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987413 A2 20000322; EP 0987413 A3 20001213; EP 0987413 B1 20031001; AR 015321 A1 20010418; BR 9904103 A 20000926; CN 1111642 C 20030618; CN 1247937 A 20000322; CO 4850638 A1 19991026; DE 69911708 D1 20031106; DE 69911708 T2 20040819; JP 2000087758 A 20000328; JP 3954732 B2 20070808; KR 100360810 B1 20021113; KR 20000023139 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-06-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69911708

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110825

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100818

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100823

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911708 P 20031106

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-04-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KANBE, TAKASHI

2003-04-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NOMURA, AKIFUMI

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020613

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010305

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02B 75/22 A, 7F 02B 61/02 B, 7F 02B 67/04 B

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI