Global Patent Index - EP 0987414 A3

EP 0987414 A3 2000-12-13 - V-type internal combustion engine for vehicle

Title (en)

V-type internal combustion engine for vehicle

Title (de)

Fahrzeugbrennkraftmaschine in V-Bauart

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne à cylindres en pour un véhicule

Publication

EP 0987414 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99116978 A

Priority

JP 26069598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0987414A2] Object: To provide a V-type internal combustion engine for a vehicle, which is capable of connecting a primary transmission unit, a starting transmission unit, first and second timing transmission units, and a generator to a crank shaft in a reasonable layout, thereby improving the assembling characteristic and the maintenance characteristic and maintaining a good balance in weight between right and left sides of a vehicular body when the engine is mounted on the vehicle. Solving Means: First and second timing transmission units 461 and 462 adjacent to each other in the axial direction, and a generator 30 adjacent to the outer side of the first and second timing transmission units 461 and 462 are connected to one end portion, projecting outwardly from a first journal 17, of a crank shaft 15, and a primary transmission unit 54 and a starting transmission unit 94 are connected to the other end, projecting outwardly from a second journal 18, of the crank shaft 15. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 75/22; F02B 61/00; F02B 61/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62M 7/02 (2006.01); F02B 61/02 (2006.01); F02B 67/00 (2006.01); F02B 75/22 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 61/02 (2013.01); F02B 75/22 (2013.01); F02B 2075/027 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1808 (2013.01); F02B 2275/20 (2013.01); F02F 2001/245 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987414 A2 20000322; EP 0987414 A3 20001213; EP 0987414 B1 20030806; CN 1113159 C 20030702; CN 1247936 A 20000322; DE 69910136 D1 20030911; DE 69910136 T2 20040609; JP 2000087756 A 20000328; JP 4021069 B2 20071212

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130827

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69910136

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120813

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69910136 P 20030911

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NOMURA, AKIFUMI

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KANBE, TAKASHI

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010308

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02B 75/22 A, 7F 02B 61/00 B, 7F 02B 61/02 B

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI