Global Patent Index - EP 0987415 A2

EP 0987415 A2 2000-03-22 - V-type internal combustion engine for motorcycle

Title (en)

V-type internal combustion engine for motorcycle

Title (de)

Motorradbrennkraftmaschine in V-Bauart

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne à cylindres en V pour un motocycle

Publication

EP 0987415 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99117047 A

Priority

JP 26069698 A

Abstract (en)

Object: To provide a V-type internal combustion engine, which is capable of mounting lifters for chain tensioners on a rear wall of a rear bank without any interference with a mission case portion, while eliminating the necessity of setting a rearward tilt angle at a particularly small value. Solving Means: A primary transmission unit 54 and a rear timing transmission unit 462 are connected to both ends of a crank shaft 15; and a side wall 95a, on the rear timing transmission unit 462 side, of a mission case portion 95 is offset on the primary transmission unit 54 side from the rear timing transmission unit 462. With this configuration, it is possible to easily mount the lifters 492 for chain tensioners on a rear wall of the rear bank 42 without interference with the mission case portion 95. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 75/22; F02B 61/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 17/06 (2006.01); B62M 7/02 (2006.01); F02B 61/02 (2006.01); F02B 67/00 (2006.01); F02B 67/06 (2006.01); F02B 75/22 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 61/02 (2013.01); F02B 75/22 (2013.01); F02B 2075/027 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1808 (2013.01); F02B 2275/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP S6483912 A 19890329 - YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987415 A2 20000322; EP 0987415 A3 20001213; EP 0987415 B1 20040526; AR 015320 A1 20010418; BR 9904130 A 20000905; CN 1113160 C 20030702; CN 1247938 A 20000322; CO 4850637 A1 19991026; DE 69917549 D1 20040701; DE 69917549 T2 20040923; JP 2000087757 A 20000328; JP 4015299 B2 20071128; KR 100360812 B1 20021113; KR 20000023141 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140830

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130819

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69917549

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130430

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110818

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-01-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69917549 P 20040701

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030131

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010312

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI