Global patent index - EP 0987416 A2

EP 0987416 A2 2000-03-22 - V-type internal combustion engine for motorcycle

Title (en)

V-type internal combustion engine for motorcycle

Title (de)

Motorradbrennkraftmaschine in V-Bauart

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne à cylindres en V pour un motocycle

Publication

EP 0987416 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99117155 A

Priority

JP 26006598 A

Abstract (en)

Object: To provide a V-type internal combustion engine for a motorcycle, having a front bank and a rear bank, which is capable of compactly forming a rear portion of a crank case and a mission case portion continuous thereto without any interference with a lubricating oil pump and a cooling water pump. Solving Means: A lubricating oil pump 57 for supplying oil to portions to be lubricated of a front bank 41 and a rear bank 42, and a cooling water pump 62 for supplying cooling water to water jackets 241 and 242 of the front and rear banks 41 and 42 are provided in a crank case 21 in such a manner as to be laterally disposed in front of and over a crank shaft 15. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 75/22; F02B 61/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62M 7/02 (2006.01); F02B 61/02 (2006.01); F02B 67/00 (2006.01); F02B 75/22 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/22 (2013.01); F02B 61/02 (2013.01); F02B 2075/027 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1808 (2013.01); F02B 2275/20 (2013.01); F02F 2001/245 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H06173832 A 19940621 - YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987416 A2 20000322; EP 0987416 A3 20001213; EP 0987416 B1 20040303; AR 015318 A1 20010418; BR 9904097 A 20000926; CN 1107158 C 20030430; CN 1247939 A 20000322; CO 4850635 A1 19991026; DE 69915199 D1 20040408; DE 69915199 T2 20040729; ES 2217659 T3 20041101; JP 2000087755 A 20000328; JP 4021068 B2 20071212; KR 100360809 B1 20021113; KR 20000023138 A 20000425; TW 404917 B 20000911

INPADOC legal status

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130819

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69915199

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120813

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090901

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100430

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2217659

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69915199

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030124

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI