Global Patent Index - EP 0987422 A1

EP 0987422 A1 2000-03-22 - Device for controlling the strength of an air-fuel mixture injected in an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Device for controlling the strength of an air-fuel mixture injected in an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Steuerung der Anreicherung eines Kraftstoffluftgemisches in einer Einspritzbrennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de régulation de la richesse en carburant du melange air/carburant admis dans un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0987422 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402003 A

Priority

FR 9811628 A

Abstract (en)

A circuit (10) evaluates the mass (Meval) of the injected fuel and has inputs of values (n) for engine speed and (Da) for intake airflow. The same inputs are fed to a flow instability evaluation circuit (14). The flow instability evaluation circuit feeds signals to a regulator circuit (13) which also receives inputs from an instability calculation circuit (12) and the fuel mass flow circuit. The instability calculation circuit receives an input from an engine torque measurement circuit (11).

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif comprend a) des moyens (10) d'évaluation d'une valeur (Meval) de la masse de carburant à injecter dans le moteur en fonction du régime (n) du moteur et du débit d'air admis (Da) dans le moteur ,b) des moyens (11) de mesure du couple (Ck) délivré par le moteur, à chaque point mort haut ,c) des moyens (12) d'estimation d'une grandeur (VALk) représentative de l'instabilité du couple, et d) des moyens (13) de calcul de la masse de carburant (Minj) à injecter réellement dans le moteur par correction de ladite valeur évaluée (Meval), en fonction de l'écart entre ladite instabilité (VALk) et une instabilité de consigne (INSTACONS) fonction du régime (n) et du débit d'air admis (Da). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1497 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987422 A1 20000322; EP 0987422 B1 20040128; DE 69914428 D1 20040304; DE 69914428 T2 20041104; FR 2783565 A1 20000324; FR 2783565 B1 20001215

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69914428

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RENAULT S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040831

2005-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RENAULT S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040831

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-07-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-05-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040509

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69914428

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES GB IT

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI