Global Patent Index - EP 0987427 A1

EP 0987427 A1 2000-03-22 - Device for recirculating an exhaust gas stream to the intake conduit of an engine

Title (en)

Device for recirculating an exhaust gas stream to the intake conduit of an engine

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Rückführung eines Abgasstromes zum Saugrohr einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour recirculer un courant de gaz d'échappement au conduit d'admission d'un moteur

Publication

EP 0987427 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112624 A

Priority

DE 19841927 A

Abstract (en)

A valve device (20) is formed as an independent component part and is fitted directly to the exhaust gas cooler (15) in the area of the inlet (16) and the outlet (17) or is incorporated with the exhaust gas cooler as a structural unit. The valve device has an input feed connection (21) and an outflow connection for the exhaust gas. The exhaust gas cooler with its inlet and outlet is connected to a by-pass path (23), which runs parallel to the feedback path (13) and bridges over it. The input feed connection of the valve device is connected to the inlet of the exhaust gas cooler.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Einrichtung zur Rückführung eines Abgasstromes zum Saugrohr (11) einer Brennkraftmaschine vorgeschlagen, mit einem in einem Rückführpfad (13) angeordneten, einen Einlaß (16) und einen Auslaß (17) für das Abgas aufweisenden Abgaskühler (15), der mittels einer Ventileinrichtung (20) wahlweise umgangen werden kann. Die Ventileinrichtung (20) ist als eigenständiges Bauteil ausgebildet und direkt an den Abgaskühler (15) im Bereich des Einlasses (16) und des Auslasses (17) angesetzt. Die Ventileinrichtung (20) weist einen Bypaßauslaß (36) und einen Bypaßeinlaß (37) auf, wobei der Bypaßauslaß (36) mit dem Einlaß (16) und der Bypaßeinlaß (37) dem Auslaß (17) des Abgaskühlers (15) beim Ansetzen der Ventileinrichtung direkt in Verbindung stehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/07 (2006.01); F28F 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 27/02 (2013.01); F02M 26/26 (2016.02); F02M 26/32 (2016.02); F02M 26/30 (2016.02); F28D 21/0003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19841927 A1 20000316; EP 0987427 A1 20000322; EP 0987427 B1 20040107

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BORGWARNER ESSLINGEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BORGWARNER ESSLINGEN GMBH, 73730 ESSLINGEN, DE; MODINE MANUFACTURING CO., RACINE, WIS., US

- Document: DE 59908232

2015-08-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908232

- Representative's name: TWELMEIER MOMMER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSA, DE

2014-12-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BORGWARNER ESSLINGEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GUSTAV WAHLER GMBH U. CO KG, MODINE MANUFACTURING CO., , US

- Document: DE 59908232

- Effective date: 20141125

2014-12-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MODINE MANUFACTURING CO., RACINE, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GUSTAV WAHLER GMBH U. CO KG, MODINE MANUFACTURING CO., , US

- Document: DE 59908232

- Effective date: 20141125

2014-12-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BORGWARNER ESSLINGEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: GUSTAV WAHLER GMBH U. CO KG, 73730 ESSLINGEN, DE; MODINE MANUFACTURING CO., RACINE, WIS., US

- Document: DE 59908232

- Effective date: 20141125

2014-12-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908232

- Representative's name: TWELMEIER MOMMER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSA, DE

- Effective date: 20130422

2014-12-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908232

- Representative's name: TWELMEIER MOMMER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSA, DE

- Effective date: 20140717

2014-12-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908232

- Representative's name: TWELMEIER MOMMER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSA, DE

- Effective date: 20141125

2014-11-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908232

- Representative's name: TWELMEIER MOMMER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSA, DE

2014-07-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908232

- Representative's name: TWELMEIER MOMMER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSA, DE

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-04-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908232

- Representative's name: WITTE, WELLER & PARTNER, DE

2013-04-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908232

- Representative's name: TWELMEIER MOMMER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSA, DE

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120803

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080702

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908232 P 20040212

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020625

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GUSTAV WAHLER GMBH U. CO

2000-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MODINE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI