Global Patent Index - EP 0987434 A1

EP 0987434 A1 2000-03-22 - Current control device for an electrical engine starter motor and starter motor having such a device

Title (en)

Current control device for an electrical engine starter motor and starter motor having such a device

Title (de)

Speisungsregelvorrichtung für elektrischen Anlassermotor für Verbrennungsmotor und Anlasser mit solcher Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la commande de l'alimentation d'un moteur électrique de démarreur de véhicule et démarreur comportant un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 0987434 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402249 A

Priority

FR 9811550 A

Abstract (en)

The starter module (D) includes a motor (M) with one terminal connected to earth and the other terminal connected to the positive terminal (B+) of the battery via a MOSFET (Metal Oxide Semiconductor Field Effect Transistor) (T2). A further MOSFET (T1) is connected in parallel with the motor transistor, with a connection to earth via a coil (B). A first terminal (e1) on a microcontroller (2) is connected to the positive terminal of the battery, and a second terminal is connected to the positive terminal and the emitters of the two transistors. The sources of the two transistors are connected to two terminals (s1,s2) on the microcontroller and the drains may be connected to further terminals (e3,e4).

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif pour la commande de l'alimentation du moteur électrique (M) d'un démarreur (D) de véhicule notamment automobile, comportant un commutateur de puissance monté en série avec ledit moteur électrique pour commander l'alimentation de celui-ci, caractérisé en ce que ce commutateur est constitué par un composant électronique de puissance commandable (T2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/06 (2006.01); F02N 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/087 (2013.01); F02N 2011/0874 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] FR 2147379 A5 19730309 - LABINAL
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 172 (M - 095) 31 October 1981 (1981-10-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987434 A1 20000322; EP 0987434 B1 20050216; BR 9904198 A 20000801; DE 69923738 D1 20050324; DE 69923738 T2 20060330; FR 2783371 A1 20000317; FR 2783371 B1 20001201; JP 2000097137 A 20000404; KR 100753736 B1 20070831; KR 20000023172 A 20000425; US 6456034 B1 20020924

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160909

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-09-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-05-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050527

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69923738

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2005-02-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-02-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050216

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030521

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI