Global Patent Index - EP 0987435 A2

EP 0987435 A2 2000-03-22 - Spark plug ignition coil assembly for direct ignition system

Title (en)

Spark plug ignition coil assembly for direct ignition system

Title (de)

Zündkerze-und-Spulensatz für direktes Zündsystem

Title (fr)

Ensemble de bobine et de bougie d'allumage pour système d'allumage intégré

Publication

EP 0987435 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99117884 A

Priority

JP 25969798 A

Abstract (en)

A spark plug and ignition coil assembly for a direct ignition system is provided. The assembly comprises a spark plug having an insulator, the insulator having a hollow upper end portion having at an outer periphery thereof a first joining section, an ignition coil, a rubber molding embedding therein the ignition coil so as to cooperate with the ignition coil to constitute an integral unit, the rubber molding having a hollow lower end portion in which the upper end portion of the insulator is fitted, the lower end portion of the rubber molding having at an inner periphery there of a second joining section joined with the first engagement section, and fastening means for fastening the first and second joining sections together. The fastening means comprises a projection provided to one of the first and second joining sections and a recess provided to the other of the first and second joining sections. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 13/00 (2006.01); F02P 3/02 (2006.01); H01T 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987435 A2 20000322; EP 0987435 A3 20020619; EP 0987435 B1 20050216; DE 69923739 D1 20050324; DE 69923739 T2 20050707; JP 2000091057 A 20000331

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69923739

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090910

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091012

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090903

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050910

2006-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050910

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69923739 P 20050324

2005-03-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-02-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI