Global Patent Index - EP 0987491 A1

EP 0987491 A1 2000-03-22 - Method for preventing flow instabilities in a burner

Title (en)

Method for preventing flow instabilities in a burner

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verhinderung von Strömungsinstabilitäten in einem Brenner

Title (fr)

Procédé pour prévenir les instabilités d'écoulement dans un brûleur

Publication

EP 0987491 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810924 A

Priority

EP 98810924 A

Abstract (en)

Disturbance air (22) is injected into the combustion air flow (15) in order to prevent the formation of coherent flow instabilities of the combustion air flow after outlet in the combustion chamber (28). The burner (26) has no premixing stretches and is operated with liquid or gaseous fuel.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren und einer Vorrichtung zum Betrieb eines Brenners (26), bei welchem ein Verbrennungsluftstrom (14) Brennstoff in eine Brennkammer (28) transportiert, wo der Brennstoff verbrannt wird, wird die Ausbildung von kohärenten Strömungsinstabilitäten des Verbrennungsluftstroms (15) nach Austritt in die Brennkammer (28) verhindert, indem Störungsluft (22) in den Verbrennungsluftstrom (15) eingedüst wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 7/00; F23C 7/02; F23D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/18 (2006.01); F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23C 7/02 (2006.01); F23D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/02 (2013.01); F23C 7/002 (2013.01); F23D 17/002 (2013.01); F23C 2900/07002 (2013.01); F23D 2206/10 (2013.01); F23D 2210/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0987491 A1 20000322; EP 0987491 B1 20050720; DE 59812944 D1 20050825; JP 2000104923 A 20000411; US 6390805 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070916

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070916

2006-09-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060926

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-10-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050917

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812944

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-08-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030617

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI